NY S07815 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fines for misbranding of fur-bearing articles of clothing; $1,000 for first violation; $2,000 for subsequent violations.
Title
Increases fines for misbranding of fur-bearing articles of clothing; $1,000 for first violation; $2,000 for subsequent violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1047 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1077 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01047 (Same As) 2016-08-19 - signed chap.252