NY S07799 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions relating to prohibiting employees of a not-for-profit corporation from serving as chair of the board.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions relating to prohibiting employees of a not-for-profit corporation from serving as chair of the board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.81 |
2014-06-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.381 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a10027a |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1481 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7799A |
2014-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10027 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7799a