NY S07788 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that one hundred percent of in-state sales of new passenger cars and trucks shall be zero-emissions by two thousand thirty-five; provides that it shall be a further goal of the state to transition to one hundred percent zero-emissions from new off-road vehicles and equipment purchased beginning in 2035, where feasible.
Title
Provides that one hundred percent of in-state sales of new passenger cars and trucks shall be zero-emissions by two thousand thirty-five; provides that it shall be a further goal of the state to transition to one hundred percent zero-emissions from new off-road vehicles and equipment purchased beginning in 2035, where feasible.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.109 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.14 |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | substituted for a8718 |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.157 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08718 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - substituted by s7788