NY S07784 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the fingerprinting of prospective child day care employees and sharing fingerprint results.
Title
Relates to the fingerprinting of prospective child day care employees and sharing fingerprint results.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.928 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2023-12-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01521 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to children and families