NY S07747 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits food service in funeral establishments subject to certain restrictions and qualifications.
Title
Permits food service in funeral establishments subject to certain restrictions and qualifications.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
2014-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1700 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7747B |
2014-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7747A |
2014-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09950 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - amended on third reading 9950a