NY S07744 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - SIGNED CHAP.457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the New York state racing franchise accountability and transparency act of 2012; creates a temporary reorganization board to serve for a period of three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the New York state racing franchise accountability and transparency act of 2012; creates a temporary reorganization board to serve for a period of three years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.457
2012-09-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.436
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10717
2012-06-19Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering
2012-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1349
2012-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10717 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7744

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback