NY S07728 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a beer production tax credit for beer produced within the state by a taxpayer that is registered as a distributor.
Title
Establishes a beer production tax credit for beer produced within the state by a taxpayer that is registered as a distributor.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.109 |
2012-07-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.375 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10695 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1300 |
2012-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10695 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7728