NY S07721 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the town of Springfield to adopt and enforce regulations restricting docks, boathouses and moorings on Otsego lake within such town.
Title
Permits the town of Springfield to adopt and enforce regulations restricting docks, boathouses and moorings on Otsego lake within such town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.449 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a8244a |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1134 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7721A |
2024-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2023-10-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08244 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - substituted by s7721a