NY S07713 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities; provides for the membership of such task force including increasing membership from eleven to thirteen members.
Title
Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities; provides for the membership of such task force including increasing membership from eleven to thirteen members.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.81 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.321 |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | substituted for a8730 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2022-01-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41 |
2022-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08730 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - substituted by s7713