NY S07677 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10409
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10409
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to study and report on the recruitment and retention of direct support professionals working with people with developmental disabilities by November 1, 2016.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to study and report on the recruitment and retention of direct support professionals working with people with developmental disabilities by November 1, 2016.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10409 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1830 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7677A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10409 (Same As) 2016-09-30 - tabled