NY S07672 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits compensation for service of auditing a return or report relating to certain taxes on utilities on a contingent fee basis.
Title
Prohibits compensation for service of auditing a return or report relating to certain taxes on utilities on a contingent fee basis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.721 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |