NY S07652 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires any person or entity operating telephone numbers, the use of which causes the caller to be billed a fee on his or her telephone bill, to provide the caller with notice of the fee to be imposed for such call and advise the caller to hang up if he or she does not want to pay the fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires any person or entity operating telephone numbers, the use of which causes the caller to be billed a fee on his or her telephone bill, to provide the caller with notice of the fee to be imposed for such call and advise the caller to hang up if he or she does not want to pay the fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.490
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.175
2012-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a4636b
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2012-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1265
2012-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A04636 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s7652

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback