NY S07649 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting the Francis Lewis Boulevard overpass at the Long Island Expressway in the city of New York, county of Queens as the "Detective Anastasios Tsakos Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting the Francis Lewis Boulevard overpass at the Long Island Expressway in the city of New York, county of Queens as the "Detective Anastasios Tsakos Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.325 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.342 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a9299 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1060 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09299 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - substituted by s7649