NY S07647 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent of financial services to examine the Green Bank at least once every calendar year and requires that a copy of such examination shall be furnished to NYSERDA, the state comptroller, the senate and the assembly.
Title
Requires the superintendent of financial services to examine the Green Bank at least once every calendar year and requires that a copy of such examination shall be furnished to NYSERDA, the state comptroller, the senate and the assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.720 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |