NY S07647 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9838
Status: Introduced on April 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9838
Summary
Relates to eligibility under the naturally occurring retirement community supportive service program; provides that an individual over the age of sixty need not be the head of the household to qualify under the program.
Title
Relates to eligibility under the naturally occurring retirement community supportive service program; provides that an individual over the age of sixty need not be the head of the household to qualify under the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9838 | |
2010-05-24 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-18 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-05-17 | 1ST REPORT CAL.551 | |
2010-04-28 | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A09838 (Same As) 2010-08-13 - signed chap.348
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07647&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |