NY S07627 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the county seat in Warren county to have at least one polling place designated for early voting.
Title
Requires the county seat in Warren county to have at least one polling place designated for early voting.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-12-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08657 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - referred to election law