NY S07613 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public officers from using their authority to compel or coerce subordinates to use their official time to perform activities intended to benefit a private business or for other compensated non-governmental purposes.
Title
Prohibits public officers from using their authority to compel or coerce subordinates to use their official time to perform activities intended to benefit a private business or for other compensated non-governmental purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1833 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2021-12-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10075 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - referred to governmental operations