NY S07612 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Oceola lake and lake Mohegan as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Oceola lake and lake Mohegan as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.265 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.451 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a9655 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1343 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09655 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7612