NY S07605 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to Buffalo city school district petitions for nomination of school board members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to Buffalo city school district petitions for nomination of school board members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.431
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.137
2012-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a10407
2012-06-13Assemblyreferred to education
2012-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1222
2012-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10407 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s7605

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback