NY A10407 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s7605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to Buffalo city school district petitions for nomination of school board members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to Buffalo city school district petitions for nomination of school board members.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-14Assemblysubstituted by s7605
2012-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.137
2012-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.137
2012-06-11Assemblyreported
2012-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-05-25Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S07605 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.431

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback