NY S07603 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9640A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9640A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Cortlandt, Dickiebusch, Furnace Brook and Meahagh lakes as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Cortlandt, Dickiebusch, Furnace Brook and Meahagh lakes as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9640A |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 7603A |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1237 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09640 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.135