NY S07600 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes November first of each year as a day of commemoration known as Military Opportunities Day.
Title
Establishes November first of each year as a day of commemoration known as Military Opportunities Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1110 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09732 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - referred to governmental operations