NY S07594 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to a restricted dental faculty license.
Title
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to a restricted dental faculty license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9915 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.806 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09915 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.301