NY S07582 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish contraband screening at correctional facilities.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish contraband screening at correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7582B |
2018-06-04 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.725 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7582A |
2018-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09885 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - print number 9885a