NY S07582 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | SIGNED CHAP.218 | |
2010-07-09 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-24 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-24 | ordered to third reading rules cal.370 | |
2010-06-24 | substituted for a11239 | |
2010-06-18 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-06-18 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.795 | |
2010-05-26 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-04-23 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A11239 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - substituted by s7582