NY S07580 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-14 - PRINT NUMBER 7580A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-14 - PRINT NUMBER 7580A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for increased independence of the office of state inspector general; requires annual reports to the legislature on the activities of the office.
Title
Provides for increased independence of the office of state inspector general; requires annual reports to the legislature on the activities of the office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7580A |
2022-10-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-12-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09609 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - referred to governmental operations