NY S07555 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the time frame in which municipalities and school districts that incur debt can make adjustments to their budget, updating the types of obligations and other technical amendments.
Title
Relates to the time frame in which municipalities and school districts that incur debt can make adjustments to their budget, updating the types of obligations and other technical amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.255 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.211 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9692 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1218 |
2012-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09692 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s7555