NY S07522 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the health department's review of correctional health services by including a biennial study of health care staffing at facilities operated by the department of corrections and community supervision.
Title
Expands the health department's review of correctional health services by including a biennial study of health care staffing at facilities operated by the department of corrections and community supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.558 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09044 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means