NY S07522 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10292A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10292A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conferring a state seal of biliteracy for students who achieve certain criteria in the language arts.
Title
Relates to conferring a state seal of biliteracy for students who achieve certain criteria in the language arts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10292A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1533 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7522A |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2012-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10292 (Same As) 2012-07-31 - signed chap.271