NY S07506 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to restrictions upon the conduct of games of chance.
Title
Relates to restrictions upon the conduct of games of chance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.455 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.584 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10411 |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1199 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A10411 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7506