NY S07498 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the New Hyde Park Exempt Volunteer Firemen's Association, Inc. use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes to include the sick and disabled.
Title
Amends the New Hyde Park Exempt Volunteer Firemen's Association, Inc. use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes to include the sick and disabled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.397 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.563 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9677 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1135 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09677 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7498