NY S07492 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6697B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6697B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain applicants for licensure as a nurse or physician who are currently licensed and in good standing in another state or territory to be granted authorization to practice in this state for a limited period of time pending a determination on licensure.
Title
Relates to allowing certain applicants for licensure as a nurse or physician who are currently licensed and in good standing in another state or territory to be granted authorization to practice in this state for a limited period of time pending a determination on licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6697B |
2023-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1854 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7492B |
2023-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7492A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06697 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - signed chap.136