NY S07488 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Center for Jewish Life.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Center for Jewish Life.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.252 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.549 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10455 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1136 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10455 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7488