NY S07479 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires loan services for loans on vacant and abandoned residential real property to pay certain condominium common charges.
Title
Requires loan services for loans on vacant and abandoned residential real property to pay certain condominium common charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4620 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.457 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-10-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04620 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - signed chap.509