NY S07461 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 7461A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 7461A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the use of restoration services when determining the capacity of a defendant to stand trial.
Title
Provides for the use of restoration services when determining the capacity of a defendant to stand trial.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7461A |
2022-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-10-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08402 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - print number 8402a