NY S07444 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for the purposes of educational leave, an eligible inmate shall include an inmate who is within two years of being an eligible inmate.
Title
Provides that for the purposes of educational leave, an eligible inmate shall include an inmate who is within two years of being an eligible inmate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.87 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-10-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07717 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means