NY S07439 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parklands for the purpose of installing an algae skimmer in Lake Agawam, and to replace such alienated parkland with a new, dedicated parkland.
Title
Authorizes the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parklands for the purpose of installing an algae skimmer in Lake Agawam, and to replace such alienated parkland with a new, dedicated parkland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.465 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.741 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7647 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1719 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07647 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - substituted by s7439