NY S07413 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Sanborn Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association, Inc.
Title
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Sanborn Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association, Inc.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1651 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-10-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08608 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT