NY S07402 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Allen, in the county Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Title
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Allen, in the county Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.282 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a10039 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.834 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10039 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s7402