NY A10039 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s7402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s7402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Allen, in the county Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Title
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Allen, in the county Allegany, to be a nonresident of such town.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s7402 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.88 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07402 (Same As) 2016-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.282