NY S07401 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage the American eel from December 31, 2016 to December 31, 2019.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage the American eel from December 31, 2016 to December 31, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10115 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1645 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10115 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - signed chap.144