NY S07385 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits private entities which process public assistance benefits through the use of electronic benefits transfers from using the name of the state of New York or holding themselves out as a state agency.
Title
Prohibits private entities which process public assistance benefits through the use of electronic benefits transfers from using the name of the state of New York or holding themselves out as a state agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1026 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |