NY S07352 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.275
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.275
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Hudson Falls, in the county of Washington, to discontinue use of certain lands as parkland, and use such lands for municipal parking.
Title
Authorizes the village of Hudson Falls, in the county of Washington, to discontinue use of certain lands as parkland, and use such lands for municipal parking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.275 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.189 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9917a |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1296 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7352A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09917 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7352a