NY S07348 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.494
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.494
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows colleges and universities participating in the higher education opportunity program to spend program funds on certain expenses beneficial to students: student travel for academic activities or conferences; expenses related to helping students apply for and prepare for graduate or professional school; the hiring of students participating in an Arthur O. Eve opportunity for higher education work-study program.
Title
Allows colleges and universities participating in the higher education opportunity program to spend program funds on certain expenses beneficial to students: student travel for academic activities or conferences; expenses related to helping students apply for and prepare for graduate or professional school; the hiring of students participating in an Arthur O. Eve opportunity for higher education work-study program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.494 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.287 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a9039a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7348A |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.931 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09039 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7348a