NY S07345 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires healthcare practitioners to provide a written or an alternative format of up to date and evidence based information on Down syndrome to pregnant women and parents of infants who test positive for Down syndrome.
Title
Requires healthcare practitioners to provide a written or an alternative format of up to date and evidence based information on Down syndrome to pregnant women and parents of infants who test positive for Down syndrome.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.836 |
2018-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |