NY S07322 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2327A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2327A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expenditures from the insurance reserve fund established by the Scarsdale union free school district.
Title
Relates to expenditures from the insurance reserve fund established by the Scarsdale union free school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2327A |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1169 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02327 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - signed chap.433