NY S07312 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10090B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10090B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to uninsured and underinsured motorist coverage for corporate and business entities, volunteer fire departments and volunteer ambulance services.
Title
Relates to uninsured and underinsured motorist coverage for corporate and business entities, volunteer fire departments and volunteer ambulance services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10090B |
2012-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1439 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7312B |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2012-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7312A |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10090 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - approval memo.22