NY S07308 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director's guidelines not contravene any provision of the state finance law and the directors report be submitted every January first beginning in twenty nineteen.
Title
Requires the director's guidelines not contravene any provision of the state finance law and the directors report be submitted every January first beginning in twenty nineteen.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.29 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.655 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted for a8943 |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-01-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.36 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08943 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7308