NY S07298 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing information on the prevention of common regulatory violations in small business regulation guides, and to the effectiveness of provisions relating thereto.
Title
Relates to providing information on the prevention of common regulatory violations in small business regulation guides, and to the effectiveness of provisions relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.22 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.656 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted for a8944 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.26 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08944 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7298