NY S07296 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the city of Syracuse to adopt ordinances regulating the registration and licensing of limousines and livery vehicles.
Title
Allows the city of Syracuse to adopt ordinances regulating the registration and licensing of limousines and livery vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1168 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7296A |
2014-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09379 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES